NY A09080 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the appointment of a monitor to oversee the Wyandanch union free school district, authorizes deficit financing and an advance of aid payments for such district.
Title
Authorizes the appointment of a monitor to oversee the Wyandanch union free school district, authorizes deficit financing and an advance of aid payments for such district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.18 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-01-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.351 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | substituted for a9080 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | referred to education |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.204 |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | substituted by s7312 |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.351 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07312 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.18