NY A09080 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - substituted by s8441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - substituted by s8441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until fourteen years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Title
Extends the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until fourteen years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | substituted by s8441 |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.412 |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S08441 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - returned to senate