NY A09089 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires consent prior to the merger of cemetery corporations by the cemetery board.
Title
Requires consent prior to the merger of cemetery corporations by the cemetery board.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.60 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.359 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.976 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7155 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.438 |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07155 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.60