NY A09089 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the occupancy tax in the village of Tuckahoe until September 1, 2025.
Title
Extends the occupancy tax in the village of Tuckahoe until September 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Assembly | signed chap.409 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.956 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8042 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.336 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.336 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08042 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9089