NY A09094 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enabling Conrad Poppenhusen to found an institution in the village of College Point, in relation to clarifying the name of such institution.
Title
Relates to enabling Conrad Poppenhusen to found an institution in the village of College Point, in relation to clarifying the name of such institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.153 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.702 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7158 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.439 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S07158 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.153