NY A09162 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an optional twenty-year retirement plan for certain members of the New York state police and fire retirement system.
Title
Creates an optional twenty-year retirement plan for certain members of the New York state police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.548 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1502 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7716 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.189 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.189 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07716 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9162