NY A09219 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-04 - print number 9219a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-04 - print number 9219a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes police officers to arrest a driver of a motor vehicle in certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes police officers to arrest a driver of a motor vehicle in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Assembly | print number 9219a |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06416 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
S00872 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S00872 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES