NY A09229 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the alternate non-voting member of the metropolitan transportation authority who is recommended by the labor organization representing the majority of employees of the Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company to be a resident of any state in which the Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company operates.
Title
Allows the alternate non-voting member of the metropolitan transportation authority who is recommended by the labor organization representing the majority of employees of the Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company to be a resident of any state in which the Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company operates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.337 |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08833 (Same As) 2024-03-19 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION