NY A09451 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - substituted by s7159a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - substituted by s7159a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage oysters.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage oysters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s7159a |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.735 |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07159 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.171