NY A09500 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-30 - substituted by s7500d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-30 - substituted by s7500d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Operations Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Operations Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Assembly | substituted by s7500d |
2018-03-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.26 |
2018-03-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-03-30 | Assembly | print number 9500d |
2018-03-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-03-30 | Assembly | print number 9500c |
2018-03-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | print number 9500b |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | print number 9500a |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07500 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.152