NY A09536 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to access to viable agricultural land for new and beginning farmers.
Title
Relates to access to viable agricultural land for new and beginning farmers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.248 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.761 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7011A |
2016-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.824 |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07011 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9536