NY A09580 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions related to the assessment and review of assessments in the county of Nassau to June 30, 2026.
Title
Extends provisions related to the assessment and review of assessments in the county of Nassau to June 30, 2026.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.396 |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |