NY A09619 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - signed chap.330
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - signed chap.330
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to aquatic invasive species and spread prevention; provides relevant definitions and further relates to launching and environmental concerns; stipulates penalties for violation of this section.
Title
Relates to aquatic invasive species and spread prevention; provides relevant definitions and further relates to launching and environmental concerns; stipulates penalties for violation of this section.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | Senate | signed chap.330 |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1703 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7851B |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.608 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.608 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 9619b |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | print number 9619a |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |