NY A09789 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - print number 9789a
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - print number 9789a
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the special powers of the environmental facilities corporation.
Title
Relates to the special powers of the environmental facilities corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | print number 9789a |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06985 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - referred to ways and means