NY A09841 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Stony Point, in the county of Rockland, to offer police officers Dennis Tobin, Thomas Clarke and Christopher Schulok an optional 20 year retirement plan.
Title
Authorizes the town of Stony Point, in the county of Rockland, to offer police officers Dennis Tobin, Thomas Clarke and Christopher Schulok an optional 20 year retirement plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s7616 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.374 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.374 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07616 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.175