NY A09954 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - signed chap.15
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - signed chap.15
Summary
Authorizes state colleges with an approved equine science program to conduct equine drug testing at race meetings.
Title
Authorizes state colleges with an approved equine science program to conduct equine drug testing at race meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | signed chap.15 | |
2010-03-12 | delivered to governor | |
2010-03-03 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-03-03 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-03-03 | 3RD READING CAL.80 | |
2010-03-03 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6352A | |
2010-03-01 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-01 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-01 | passed assembly | |
2010-02-25 | advanced to third reading cal.704 | |
2010-02-25 | reported | |
2010-02-18 | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S6352-A (Same As) 2010-03-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9954
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09954&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |