NY A10016 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7325b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7325b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an energy system tax stabilization reserve fund in the Lowville Central School District to lessen or prevent increases in the school district's real property tax levy resulting from decreases in revenue due to changes in or termination of the payments in lieu of taxes receivable by the school district.
Title
Establishes an energy system tax stabilization reserve fund in the Lowville Central School District to lessen or prevent increases in the school district's real property tax levy resulting from decreases in revenue due to changes in or termination of the payments in lieu of taxes receivable by the school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s7325b |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.455 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | print number 10016b |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | print number 10016a |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07325 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.379