NY A10095 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the director of the division of minority and women's business development to provide for the minority and women-owned business certification of business entities owned by Indian nations or tribes.
Title
Directs the director of the division of minority and women's business development to provide for the minority and women-owned business certification of business entities owned by Indian nations or tribes.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Andrew Goodell [R] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.256 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1825 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7430 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.859 |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07430 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10095