NY A10108 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Orange county as the "Catholic War Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Orange county as the "Catholic War Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | print number 10108b |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | print number 10108a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |