NY A10118 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.65
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.65
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain providers that extend specific terms of commercial financing to a recipient to disclose certain information about the offer to the recipient, including information concerning the financing amount, finance charges, the annual percentage rate, the total repayment amount, the term, payment amounts, other potential fees, any prepayment costs and a description of any collateral requirements.
Title
Requires certain providers that extend specific terms of commercial financing to a recipient to disclose certain information about the offer to the recipient, including information concerning the financing amount, finance charges, the annual percentage rate, the total repayment amount, the term, payment amounts, other potential fees, any prepayment costs and a description of any collateral requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.65 |
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.369 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.264 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10118a |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.886 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5470B |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-03-13 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5470A |
2020-03-13 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s5470b |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.264 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.264 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10118a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S05470 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.65