NY A10218 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the city of Hornell, county of Steuben to accept from St. Ann's Academy an application for exemptions from real property taxes for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the city of Hornell, county of Steuben to accept from St. Ann's Academy an application for exemptions from real property taxes for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s7926 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.412 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.412 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07926 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.229