NY A10220 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - rules report cal.367
Hearing: Jun 3 Assembly Rules Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - rules report cal.367
Hearing: Jun 3 Assembly Rules Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of taxation and finance to disclose certain information to the department of environmental conservation or the New York state energy research and development authority for the purpose of implementing the New York state climate leadership and community protection act.
Title
Authorizes the department of taxation and finance to disclose certain information to the department of environmental conservation or the New York state energy research and development authority for the purpose of implementing the New York state climate leadership and community protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.367 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09711 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE