NY A10377 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the licensure of private proprietary schools.
Title
Extends the licensure of private proprietary schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Senate | signed chap.328 |
2018-10-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.973 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8215 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.851 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08215 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10377