NY A10385 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the city of New Rochelle to impose an occupancy tax.
Title
Extends the authority of the city of New Rochelle to impose an occupancy tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.162 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2097 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.250 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.250 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08350 (Same As) 2018-05-02 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS