NY A10448 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows pharmacies to electronically transfer prescriptions to other pharmacies.
Title
Allows pharmacies to electronically transfer prescriptions to other pharmacies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.468 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1941 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7537A |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.420 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.420 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07537 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10448