NY A10450 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of general services to include requirements in any procurement for the manufacturing or retrofitting of zero emission vehicles and charging or fueling infrastructure that the components and parts used or supplied in the performance of the contract or any subcontract thereto shall be produced or made in whole or substantial part in the United States, its territories or possessions and that final assembly of the zero emission vehicles and charging or fueling infrastructure shall occur in the United States, its territories or possessions.
Title
Directs the commissioner of general services to include requirements in any procurement for the manufacturing or retrofitting of zero emission vehicles and charging or fueling infrastructure that the components and parts used or supplied in the performance of the contract or any subcontract thereto shall be produced or made in whole or substantial part in the United States, its territories or possessions and that final assembly of the zero emission vehicles and charging or fueling infrastructure shall occur in the United States, its territories or possessions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s9382 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.589 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09382 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.112