NY A10500 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the confidentiality of contact tracing information from the identification of individuals who have come in contact with an individual with a confirmed or probable diagnosis of novel coronavirus, COVID-19.
Title
Provides for the confidentiality of contact tracing information from the identification of individuals who have come in contact with an individual with a confirmed or probable diagnosis of novel coronavirus, COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.69 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.377 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.908 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8450C |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.208 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.208 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 10500c |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 10500b |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | print number 10500a |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08450 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.69