NY A10514 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - signed chap.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - signed chap.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to Watertown city court judges; replaces one full-time judgeship with a part-time judgeship.
Title
Relates to Watertown city court judges; replaces one full-time judgeship with a part-time judgeship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.330 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.855 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8302 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.144 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08302 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - signed chap.330