NY A10522 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Validates, ratifies and confirms certain bonds issued by the village of Dansville, in the county of Livingston, and authorizes issuance of further bonds to finance the objects and purposes of the validated bonds.
Title
Validates, ratifies and confirms certain bonds issued by the village of Dansville, in the county of Livingston, and authorizes issuance of further bonds to finance the objects and purposes of the validated bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7498 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.592 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07498 (Same As) 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.353