NY A10560 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the filling of borrow pits in Jamaica Bay and the effectiveness thereof; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Relates to the filling of borrow pits in Jamaica Bay and the effectiveness thereof; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s8043 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.465 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08043 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.499