NY A10575 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes part-time police officer positions in the villages of Corfu and LeRoy in Genesee county non-competitive for civil service purposes.
Title
Makes part-time police officer positions in the villages of Corfu and LeRoy in Genesee county non-competitive for civil service purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.337 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1484 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7553 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.464 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.464 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07553 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10575