NY A10598 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8062
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8062
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the taking and filing of oaths of office; authorizes officials who failed to take or file their required oath of office within the statutorily prescribed period to take and file such oaths within thirty days of the effective date of this act.
Title
Authorizes the taking and filing of oaths of office; authorizes officials who failed to take or file their required oath of office within the statutorily prescribed period to take and file such oaths within thirty days of the effective date of this act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s8062 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.468 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | print number 10598a |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08062 (Same As) 2016-07-05 - SIGNED CHAP.94