NY A10627 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the conveyance of land formerly used as an armory to the city of Rome in the county of Oneida.
Title
Relates to the conveyance of land formerly used as an armory to the city of Rome in the county of Oneida.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.340 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1324 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7621 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.373 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.373 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07621 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10627