NY A10713 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automated ticket purchasing software.
Title
Relates to automated ticket purchasing software.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.472 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1983 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8123 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.482 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.482 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08123 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10713