NY A10857 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - substituted by s7996
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - substituted by s7996
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage lobster.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage lobster.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7996 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1084 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07996 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.443