NY A10928 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6942a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6942a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Stride, Inc. to file an application for retroactive real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Stride, Inc. to file an application for retroactive real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6942a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.382 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.382 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06942 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.482