NY A11030 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the presumption that an injured worker who has not refused an offer of reemployment from his or her employer has not voluntarily withdrawn from the labor market for compensation purposes.
Title
Relates to the presumption that an injured worker who has not refused an offer of reemployment from his or her employer has not voluntarily withdrawn from the labor market for compensation purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.205 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.205 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07865 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR