NY A11043 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to insurance coverage for enteral formula; includes additional diseases and disorders for which enteral formula has been proven effective.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to insurance coverage for enteral formula; includes additional diseases and disorders for which enteral formula has been proven effective.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatesigned chap.469
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2073
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8924
2018-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.206
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.206
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-05-31Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S08924 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11043

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11043&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11043&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A11043
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11043&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11043&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11043&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11043&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A11043#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback