NY A11054 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6839a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6839a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the village of Philadelphia, county of Jefferson as the "New York State Trooper Joel R. Davis Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the village of Philadelphia, county of Jefferson as the "New York State Trooper Joel R. Davis Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6839a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.392 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.392 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06839 (Same As) 2018-09-28 - SIGNED CHAP.278