NY A11068 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - advanced to third reading cal.937
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - advanced to third reading cal.937
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the ability of school districts, charter schools, and Boards of Cooperative Educational Services (BOCES) to make conditional appointments of prospective employees under certain necessary conditions and to limit the duration of a conditional appointment.
Title
Extends effectiveness of chapter 147 of the laws of 2001, amending the education law relating to conditional appointment of school district, charter school or BOCES employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | advanced to third reading cal.937 | |
2010-05-18 | reported | |
2010-05-12 | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07817 (Same As) 2010-06-25 - referred to education