NY A11672 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - substituted by s8454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - substituted by s8454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2010, relating to prevailing wages for service workers.
Title
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2010, relating to prevailing wages for service workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | substituted by s8454 | |
2010-11-29 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-07-30 | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08454 (Same As) 2010-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.6839