NY K00845 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializing Governor Andrew M. Cuomo to proclaim March 11, 2020, to April 12, 2020, as Garifuna-American Heritage Month in the State of New York
Title
Memorializing Governor Andrew M. Cuomo to proclaim March 11, 2020, to April 12, 2020, as Garifuna-American Heritage Month in the State of New York
Sponsors
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Victor Pichardo [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] |
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Assembly | adopted |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to calendar |