NY S00015 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain shelters for victims of domestic violence to be reimbursed for any payment differential for housing a single individual in a room intended for double occupancy.
Title
Authorizes certain shelters for victims of domestic violence to be reimbursed for any payment differential for housing a single individual in a room intended for double occupancy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A02583 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - reported referred to ways and means