NY S00023 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to maintaining the continued viability of the state's existing large-scale, renewable energy resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to maintaining the continued viability of the state's existing large-scale, renewable energy resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.639
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a4294
2019-03-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-03-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.167
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04294 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s23

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback