NY S00085 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A220B
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A220B
Summary
Extends North Bellmore union free school district payback on state aid overpayments during the 2004-2005 and 2005-2006 school years to six years beginning with June 1, 2009.
Title
Extends North Bellmore union free school district payback on state aid overpayments during the 2004-2005 and 2005-2006 school years to six years beginning with June 1, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-15 | SUBSTITUTED BY A220B | |
2009-07-09 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 85B | |
2009-06-02 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-01 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-27 | 1ST REPORT CAL.475 | |
2009-05-12 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-08 | PRINT NUMBER 85A | |
2009-04-08 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2009-01-07 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A220-B (Same As) 2011-01-05 - referred to local governments
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00085&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |