NY S00118 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 118A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 118A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for all medical professionals as part of their licensing requirements; requires biennial training in the non-discriminatory provision of medical services for physicians, physician assistants, dentists, dental hygienists, registered and licensed practical nurses, podiatrists, and optometrists; authorizes the department of education to develop the training in consultation with the department of health and other experts; provides for documentation and exemption from the requirements; provides for a public education program on minority health; appropriates $100,000 therefor.
Title
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for all medical professionals as part of their licensing requirements; requires biennial training in the non-discriminatory provision of medical services for physicians, physician assistants, dentists, dental hygienists, registered and licensed practical nurses, podiatrists, and optometrists; authorizes the department of education to develop the training in consultation with the department of health and other experts; provides for documentation and exemption from the requirements; provides for a public education program on minority health; appropriates $100,000 therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 118A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-03-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01434 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - print number 1434a