NY S00119 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 119A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 119A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the deferral of awards granted under the Tuition Assistance Program (TAP); ensures that a TAP award will be paid on time so that the student may pay his or her tuition bill on time.
Title
Prohibits the deferral of awards granted under the Tuition Assistance Program (TAP); ensures that a TAP award will be paid on time so that the student may pay his or her tuition bill on time.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 119A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2011-04-06 | Senate | DEFEATED IN HIGHER EDUCATION |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01280 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - print number 1280a