NY S00241 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a person who intentionally obstructs the efforts of any firefighter performing emergency medical care on a sick or injured person is guilty of the crime of obstructing firefighting operations.
Title
Establishes a person who intentionally obstructs the efforts of any firefighter performing emergency medical care on a sick or injured person is guilty of the crime of obstructing firefighting operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-02-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.178 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.304 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02821 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to codes