NY S00241 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where a person responsible for the welfare of a child under the age of eight leaves such child inside a motor vehicle without the supervision of a person who is at least twelve years of age, under conditions which knowingly or recklessly present a significant risk to the health or safety of such child, such person shall be guilty of an infraction.
Title
Provides that where a person responsible for the welfare of a child under the age of eight leaves such child inside a motor vehicle without the supervision of a person who is at least twelve years of age, under conditions which knowingly or recklessly present a significant risk to the health or safety of such child, such person shall be guilty of an infraction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.122 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-03-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.85 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |