NY S00260 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the employment of a sex offender in any position having substantial contact with children; defines "substantial contact" as any activity involving children; establishes criminal penalties for violation of statutory provisions.
Title
Prohibits the employment of a sex offender in any position having substantial contact with children; defines "substantial contact" as any activity involving children; establishes criminal penalties for violation of statutory provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.430 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.184 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04151 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to correction